MO SB782 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-22 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-22 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to the Department of Natural Resources
Title
Modifies provisions relating to the Department of Natural Resources
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - House - House: SB 782 SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 99 N: 36 NV: 1 Abs: 25) [PASS]
2018-03-29 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 23 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - House - House: SB 782 SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 99 N: 36 NV: 1 Abs: 25) [PASS]
2018-03-29 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 23 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-22 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Delivered to Governor |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Signed by House Speaker |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Signed by Senate President Pro Tem |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Reported Duly Enrolled Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions & Ethics Committee |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed |
2018-05-03 | House | S Third Read and Passed |
2018-05-03 | House | S concurs in HCS, as amended |
2018-05-02 | House | H Third Read and Passed |
2018-05-02 | House | HCS, as amended, H adopted |
2018-05-02 | House | HA 3 to HCS H offered & adopted (Fitzwater)--(5203H05.06H) |
2018-05-02 | House | HA 2 to HCS H offered & adopted (Matthiesen)--(5203H05.01H) |
2018-05-02 | House | HA 1 to HCS H offered & adopted (Brattin)--(5203H05.02H) |
2018-05-01 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass H Fiscal Review |
2018-05-01 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass H Fiscal Reviw |
2018-04-30 | House | Referred H Fiscal Review |
2018-04-26 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass H Rules - Administrative Oversight |
2018-04-25 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass H Rules - Administrative Oversight |
2018-04-19 | House | Referred H Rules - Administrative Oversight |
2018-04-19 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass H Conservation and Natural Resources |
2018-04-18 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass H Conservation and Natural Resources |
2018-04-11 | House | Hearing Conducted H Conservation and Natural Resources |
2018-04-04 | House | Referred H Conservation and Natural Resources |
2018-04-02 | House | H Second Read |
2018-03-29 | House | H First Read |
2018-03-29 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Reported from S Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Referred S Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Perfected |
2018-03-26 | Senate | SS for SCS, as amended, S adopted |
2018-03-26 | Senate | SA 3 to SS for SCS S offered & defeated (Schupp)--(5203S04.05S) |
2018-03-26 | Senate | SA 2 to SS for SCS, as amended, S adopted |
2018-03-26 | Senate | SA 1 to SA 2 to SS for SCS S offered & adopted (Schupp)--(5203S04.06S) |
2018-03-26 | Senate | SA 2 to SS for SCS S offered (Eigel)--(5203S04.02S) |
2018-03-26 | Senate | SA 1 to SS for SCS S offered & adopted (Hegeman)--(5203S04.01S) |
2018-03-26 | Senate | SS for SCS S offered (Cunningham)--(5203S.04F) |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Reported from S Agriculture, Food Production and Outdoor Resources Committee w/SCS |
2018-02-26 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Agriculture, Food Production and Outdoor Resources Committee (5203S.02C) |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Committee Vote Reconsidered |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Agriculture, Food Production and Outdoor Resources Committee |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Agriculture, Food Production and Outdoor Resources Committee |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Agriculture, Food Production and Outdoor Resources Committee |
2018-01-03 | Senate | S First Read--SB 782-Cunningham |
2017-12-07 | Senate | Prefiled |