MO SB78 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-14 - H Informal Calendar Senate Bills for Third Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-14 - H Informal Calendar Senate Bills for Third Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to certain state employees
Title
Modifies provisions relating to certain state employees
Sponsors
Sen. Doug Beck [D] | Sen. Curtis Trent [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-27 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-14 | House | H Informal Calendar Senate Bills for Third Reading |
2021-05-13 | House | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2021-05-06 | House | Reported Do Pass H Rules - Legislative Oversight |
2021-05-06 | House | Voted Do Pass H Rules - Legislative Oversight |
2021-05-04 | House | Referred H Rules - Legislative Oversight |
2021-05-04 | House | Reported Do Pass H General Laws |
2021-05-04 | House | Voted Do Pass H General Laws |
2021-05-03 | House | Hearing Conducted H General Laws |
2021-04-29 | House | Referred H General Laws |
2021-04-29 | House | H Second Read |
2021-04-28 | House | H First Read |
2021-04-27 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Perfected, as amended |
2021-04-20 | Senate | SA 4 S offered & adopted (Hough)--(0521S01.06S) |
2021-04-20 | Senate | SA 3 S offered & adopted (Brattin)--(0521S01.05S) |
2021-04-20 | Senate | SA 2, as amended, S adopted |
2021-04-20 | Senate | SA 1 to SA 2 S offered & adopted (Washington)--(0521S01.07S) |
2021-04-20 | Senate | SA 2 S offered (Bernskoetter)--(0521S01.04S) |
2021-04-20 | Senate | SA 1 S offered & adopted (May)--(0521S01.03S) |
2021-04-20 | Senate | SS S withdrawn |
2021-04-20 | Senate | SA 1 to SS S offered (Onder)--(0521S02.01S) |
2021-04-20 | Senate | SS S offered (Beck)--(0521S.02F) |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Reported from S Seniors, Families, Veterans & Military Affairs Committee |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Removed S Consent Calendar |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Reported from S Seniors, Families, Veterans & Military Affairs Committee - Consent |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Motion to pass bill as consent taken by S Seniors, Families, Veterans & Military Affairs Committee - Consent vote adopted |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Seniors, Families, Veterans & Military Affairs Committee |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Seniors, Families, Veterans & Military Affairs Committee |
2021-01-14 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Seniors, Families, Veterans & Military Affairs Committee |
2021-01-06 | Senate | S First Read |
2020-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |