MO SB772 | 2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2022 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-01-27 - SCS Voted Do Pass S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee (3957S.02C)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Establishes the Community Investment Corporation Development Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes the Community Investment Corporation Development Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-01-27SenateSCS Voted Do Pass S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee (3957S.02C)
2022-01-20SenateHearing Conducted S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee
2022-01-13SenateSecond Read and Referred S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee
2022-01-05SenateS First Read
2021-12-01SenatePrefiled

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback