MO SB77 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-05 - Hearing Conducted S Ways and Means Committee
Pending: Senate Ways And Means And Fiscal Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-05 - Hearing Conducted S Ways and Means Committee
Pending: Senate Ways And Means And Fiscal Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Reauthorizes the Missouri Homestead Preservation tax credit program
Title
Reauthorizes the Missouri Homestead Preservation tax credit program
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-05 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Ways and Means Committee |
2015-01-22 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Ways and Means Committee |
2015-01-07 | Senate | S First Read--SB 77-Sifton |
2014-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/15info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=80 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/15info/pdf-bill/intro/SB77.pdf |