MO SB758 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 21 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-16 - H Calendar S Bills for Third Reading w/HCS
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-16 - H Calendar S Bills for Third Reading w/HCS
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Changes the term "free health clinic" to "community health clinic" and modifies its definition for the purposes of the State Legal Expense Fund
Title
Changes the term "free health clinic" to "community health clinic" and modifies its definition for the purposes of the State Legal Expense Fund
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-16 | House | H Calendar S Bills for Third Reading w/HCS |
2014-05-05 | House | Reported Do Pass H Rules Committee |
2014-05-05 | House | Voted Do Pass H Rules Committee |
2014-04-30 | House | Referred to H Rules Committee |
2014-04-30 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass H Special Standing Committee on Emerging Issues in Health Care Committee |
2014-04-30 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass H Special Standing Committee on Emerging Issues in Health Care Committee |
2014-04-30 | House | Hearing Conducted H Special Standing Committee on Emerging Issues in Health Care Committee |
2014-04-22 | House | Referred H Special Standing Committee on Emerging Issues in Health Care Committee |
2014-04-22 | House | H Second Read |
2014-04-17 | House | H First Read |
2014-04-17 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Perfected |
2014-04-15 | Senate | SS, as amended, S adopted |
2014-04-15 | Senate | SA 1 to SS S offered & adopted (Justus)--(4486S03.01S) |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2014-04-15 | Senate | SS S offered (Justus)--(4486S.03F) |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Reported from S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee to Floor |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Hearing Cancelled S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee |
2014-01-21 | Senate | S First Read--SB 758-Justus |