MO SB751 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-18 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 751-Schatz
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-18 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 751-Schatz
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Repeals the requirement for the Department of Transportation to participate in arbitration as a defendant at the request of the plaintiff in a tort claim
Title
Repeals the requirement for the Department of Transportation to participate in arbitration as a defendant at the request of the plaintiff in a tort claim
Sponsors
Sen. Dave Schatz [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-18 | Senate | Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 751-Schatz |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Bill placed on Informal Calendar |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Reported from S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee |
2018-01-03 | Senate | S First Read--SB 751-Schatz |
2017-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/18info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=69471874 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/18info/pdf-bill/intro/SB751.pdf |