MO SB749 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Vetoed on July 12 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-09-12 - Delivered to the Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Provides protection for religious beliefs as to the imposition of certain health care services such as abortion, contraception, or sterilization

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides protection for religious beliefs as to the imposition of certain health care services such as abortion, contraception, or sterilization

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2012-09-12 Delivered to the Secretary of State
2012-09-12 Motion to override Governor's Veto - H adopted
2012-09-12 Motion to override Governor's Veto - S adopted
2012-07-12 Vetoed by Governor
2012-05-30 Delivered to Governor
2012-05-30 Signed by House Speaker
2012-05-30 Signed by Senate President
2012-05-30 Reported Duly Enrolled S Rules Committee
2012-05-18 Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed
2012-05-18 CCS H Third Read and Passed - EC adopted
2012-05-18 CCR H adopted (5697S10.01F)
2012-05-18 CCS S Third Read and Passed - EC adopted
2012-05-18 CCR S offered & adopted (5697S10.1SR)
2012-05-17 H submits CCR
2012-05-17 S conferees appointed: Lamping, Dempsey, Richard, Justus, Curls
2012-05-16 H conferees appointed: Jones-89, Crawford, Cox, McCreery, Black
2012-05-16 H refuses to recede and grants conference
2012-05-16 S requests H recede or grant conference
2012-05-16 S refuses to concur in HCS, as amended
2012-05-16 H Third Read and Passed - EC adopted
2012-05-16 HCS, as amended, H adopted
2012-05-16 HA 4 to HCS H offered & adopted (Frederick)--(5697L09.09H)
2012-05-16 HA 3 to HCS H offered & adopted (Brattin)--(5697L09.05H)
2012-05-16 HA 2 to HCS H offered & adopted (Cox)--(5697L09.01F)
2012-05-16 HA 1 to HCS H offered & adopted (Barnes)--(5697L09.11H)
2012-05-14 HCS Reported Do Pass H Rules Pursuant Committee
2012-05-10 HCS Voted Do Pass H Rules Pursuant Committee
2012-05-10 Hearing Conducted H Rules Pursuant Committee
2012-05-10 Referred to Rules Committee pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f)
2012-05-10 HCS Reported Do Pass H Health Insurance Committee
2012-05-01 Hearing Conducted H Health Insurance Committee
2012-04-24 Hearing Continued H Health Insurance Committee
2012-04-18 Referred H Health Insurance Committee
2012-03-30 H Second Read
2012-03-29 H First Read (w/EC)
2012-03-29 S Third Read and Passed - EC adopted
2012-03-27 Reported Truly Perfected S Rules Committee
2012-03-27 Perfected
2012-03-27 SS, as amended, S adopted
2012-03-27 SA 2 S adopted
2012-03-27 Bill Placed on Informal Calendar
2012-03-27 SA 2 to SS S offered (Lamping)--(5697S02.51S)
2012-03-27 SA 1 to SS S withdrawn
2012-02-21 Bill Placed on Informal Calendar
2012-02-21 SA 1 to SS S offered (Justus)--(5697S02.43S)
2012-02-21 SS S offered (Lamping)--(5697S.02F)
2012-02-16 Reported from S Small Business, Insurance and Industry Committee to Floor
2012-02-14 Voted Do Pass S Small Business, Insurance and Industry Committee
2012-02-14 Hearing Conducted S Small Business, Insurance and Industry Committee
2012-02-09 Second Read and Referred S Small Business, Insurance and Industry Committee
2012-02-02 S First Read--SB 749-Lamping, et al

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback