MO SB735 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-13 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-13 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies laws relating to the Court Automation Fund, the Basic Legal Services Fund, and public defenders
Title
Modifies laws relating to the Court Automation Fund, the Basic Legal Services Fund, and public defenders
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-13 - House - House: SB 735 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 136 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2016-05-13 - House - House: SB 735 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 137 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2016-05-09 - House - House: SB 735 SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 113 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2016-03-31 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-05-13 - House - House: SB 735 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 137 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2016-05-09 - House - House: SB 735 SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 113 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2016-03-31 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-13 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Delivered to Governor |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Signed by House Speaker |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Signed by Senate President Pro Tem |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Reported Duly Enrolled Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions & Ethics Committee |
2016-05-13 | Senate | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed |
2016-05-13 | Senate | CCS H Third Read and Passed |
2016-05-13 | Senate | CCR H adopted |
2016-05-12 | House | CCS S Third Read and Passed--(4367S.03S) |
2016-05-12 | House | CCR S offered & adopted--(4367S03.1SR) |
2016-05-12 | House | Reported Do Pass H Fiscal Review |
2016-05-12 | House | Voted Do Pass H Fiscal Review Committee |
2016-05-11 | House | Referred H Fiscal Review Committee |
2016-05-11 | House | H distributes CCR |
2016-05-10 | House | S conferees appointed: Dixon, Pearce, Silvey, Schupp, Sifton |
2016-05-10 | House | H conferees appointed: Cornejo, McGaugh, Haahr, Colona, Mitten |
2016-05-10 | House | H refuses to recede and grants conference |
2016-05-10 | House | S refuses to concur in HCS, as amended and requests H recede or grant conference |
2016-05-09 | House | H Third Read and Passed |
2016-05-09 | House | HCS, as amended, H adopted |
2016-05-09 | House | HA 1 to HCS H offered & adopted (McCaherty)--(4367H02.33H) |
2016-04-28 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass H Select Committee on Judiciary (Pursuant to H Rule 27.9) |
2016-04-28 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass H Select Committee on Judiciary (Pursuant to H Rule 27.9) |
2016-04-26 | House | Referred H Select Committee on Judiciary (Pursuant to H Rule 27.9) |
2016-04-26 | House | Reported Do Pass H Civil and Criminal Proceedings w/HCAs 1 & 2 |
2016-04-25 | House | Voted Do Pass H Civil and Criminal Proceedings w/Amendments |
2016-04-20 | House | Hearing Conducted H Civil and Criminal Proceedings |
2016-04-11 | House | Referred H Civil and Criminal Proceedings |
2016-04-04 | House | H Second Read |
2016-03-31 | House | H First Read |
2016-03-31 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed - Consent |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Reported from S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee - Consent |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Motion to pass bill as consent taken by S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee - Consent vote adopted |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee |
2016-01-11 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee |
2016-01-06 | Senate | S First Read--SB 735-Dixon |
2015-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |