MO SB731 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-27 - Hearing Conducted S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee
Pending: Senate Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-27 - Hearing Conducted S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee
Pending: Senate Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Removes the current ban on carrying concealed firearms in higher education institutions, but allows institutions to ban concealed firearms under certain conditions
Title
Removes the current ban on carrying concealed firearms in higher education institutions, but allows institutions to ban concealed firearms under certain conditions
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-27 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee |
2016-01-11 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee |
2016-01-06 | Senate | S First Read--SB 731-Munzlinger |
2015-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/16info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=22246427 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/16info/pdf-bill/intro/SB731.pdf |