MO SB729 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-10 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Modifies provisions relating to county purchases

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Modifies provisions relating to county purchases

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2012-07-10 Signed by Governor
2012-05-30 Delivered to Governor
2012-05-30 Signed by House Speaker
2012-05-30 Signed by Senate President
2012-05-30 Reported Duly Enrolled S Rules Committee
2012-05-18 Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed
2012-05-18 H Third Read and Passed
2012-05-18 H recedes in HCS#2, as amended
2012-05-18 Motion to grant conference H withdrawn
2012-05-18 Motion to reconsider the vote by which the conference was granted H adopted
2012-05-17 H refuses to recede and grants conference
2012-05-17 S requests H recede or grant conference
2012-05-17 S refuses to concur in HCS#2, as amended
2012-05-17 H Third Read and Passed - EC adopted
2012-05-17 HCS#2, as amended, H adopted
2012-05-17 HA 9 to HCS#2 H offered & adopted (Brattin)--(5641L09.68H)
2012-05-17 HA 8 to HCS#2, as amended, H adopted
2012-05-17 HA 1 to HA 8 to HCS#2 H offered & adopted (Flanigan)--(5641L09.69H)
2012-05-17 HA 8 to HCS#2 H offered (Neth)--(5641L09.55H)
2012-05-17 HA 7 to HCS#2 H offered & defeated (Schupp)--(5641L09.06H)
2012-05-17 HA 6 to HCS#2 H offered & adopted (Nolte)--(5641L09.59H)
2012-05-17 HA 5 to HCS#2 H offered & adopted (Cookson)--(5641L09.46H)
2012-05-17 HA 4 to HCS#2 H offered & adopted (Cox)--(5641L09.52H)
2012-05-17 HA 3 to HCS#2 H offered & adopted (Franz)--(5641L09.51H)
2012-05-17 HA 2 to HCS#2 H offered & adopted (Hough)--(5641L09.48H)
2012-05-17 HA 1 to HCS#2 H offered & adopted (Diehl)--(5641L09.01F)
2012-05-15 HCS#2 Reported Do Pass H Rules Pursuant Committee
2012-05-10 HCS#2 Voted Do Pass H Rules Pursuant Committee
2012-05-10 Hearing Conducted H Rules Pursuant Committee
2012-05-09 Referred to Rules Committee pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f)
2012-05-09 HCS#2 Reported Do Pass H Local Government Committee
2012-05-09 HCS#2 Voted Do Pass H Local Government Committee
2012-05-09 Hearing Conducted H Local Government Committee
2012-05-03 HCS Returned to committee of origin
2012-05-03 Voted to return to committee of origin
2012-05-03 Hearing Conducted H Rules Pursuant Committee
2012-04-26 Referred to Rules Committee pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f)
2012-04-26 HCS Reported Do Pass H Local Government Committee
2012-04-25 HCS Voted Do Pass H Local Government Committee
2012-04-18 Hearing Conducted H Local Government Committee
2012-04-12 Referred H Local Government Committee
2012-04-10 H Second Read
2012-04-05 H First Read
2012-04-05 S Third Read and Passed
2012-04-03 Reported Truly Perfected S Rules Committee
2012-04-03 Perfected
2012-04-03 SCS S adopted
2012-03-22 Reported from S Jobs, Economic Development and Local Government Committee to Floor w/SCS
2012-02-22 SCS Voted Do Pass S Jobs, Economic Development and Local Government Committee - (5641S.03C)
2012-02-15 Hearing Conducted S Jobs, Economic Development and Local Government Committee
2012-02-02 Second Read and Referred S Jobs, Economic Development and Local Government Committee
2012-02-01 S First Read--SB 729-Schaefer

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback