MO SB727 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-02 - SCS Voted Do Pass (w/SCS SB's 727 & 890) Health and Pensions Committee (4122S.02C)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-02 - SCS Voted Do Pass (w/SCS SB's 727 & 890) Health and Pensions Committee (4122S.02C)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to certificates of need
Title
Modifies provisions relating to certificates of need
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-02 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass (w/SCS SB's 727 & 890) Health and Pensions Committee (4122S.02C) |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Health and Pensions Committee |
2022-01-13 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Health and Pensions Committee |
2022-01-05 | Senate | S First Read |
2021-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |