MO SB727 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on June 11 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-10 - Legislature voted to override Governor's veto
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on June 11 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-10 - Legislature voted to override Governor's veto
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to farmers' market and SNAP benefits
Title
Modifies provisions relating to farmers' market and SNAP benefits
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-10 | Senate | Legislature voted to override Governor's veto |
2014-09-10 | Senate | H adopted motion to override Governor's veto |
2014-09-10 | Senate | S adopted motion to override Governor's veto |
2014-06-11 | Senate | Vetoed by Governor |
2014-05-30 | Senate | Delivered to Governor |
2014-05-30 | Senate | Signed by House Speaker |
2014-05-30 | Senate | Signed by Senate President Pro Tem |
2014-05-30 | Senate | Reported Duly Enrolled S Rules Committee |
2014-05-16 | Senate | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed |
2014-05-16 | House | S Third Read and Passed - Consent |
2014-05-16 | House | S concurs in HCS, as amended |
2014-05-14 | House | H Third Read and Passed |
2014-05-14 | House | HCS, as amended, H adopted |
2014-05-14 | House | HA 2 to HCS H offered & adopted (Wieland)--(5396H02.18H) |
2014-05-14 | House | HA 1 to HCS H offered & adopted (Johnson)--(5396H02.01H) |
2014-05-07 | House | Reported Do Pass H Fiscal Review Committee |
2014-05-07 | House | Voted Do Pass H Fiscal Review Committee |
2014-05-05 | House | Referred H Fiscal Review Committee |
2014-04-29 | House | Reported Do Pass H Rules Committee |
2014-04-29 | House | Voted Do Pass H Rules Committee |
2014-04-23 | House | Referred to H Rules Committee |
2014-04-23 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass H Emerging Issues in Agriculture Committee |
2014-04-23 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass H Emerging Issues in Agriculture Committee |
2014-04-23 | House | Hearing Conducted H Emerging Issues in Agriculture Committee |
2014-04-17 | House | Referred H Emerging Issues in Agriculture Committee |
2014-04-07 | House | H Second Read |
2014-04-03 | House | H First Read |
2014-04-03 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Reported from S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee to Floor |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Referred S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Perfected, as amended |
2014-03-25 | Senate | SA 1 S offered & adopted (Munzlinger)--(5396S01.01S) |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Reported from S Ways and Means Committee to Floor |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Ways and Means Committee |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Ways and Means Committee |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Ways and Means Committee |
2014-01-15 | Senate | S First Read--SB 727-Chappelle-Nadal |