MO SB723 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-09 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-09 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Raises the cap on the amount of revenue bonds that may be issued by the Board of Public Buildings
Title
Raises the cap on the amount of revenue bonds that may be issued by the Board of Public Buildings
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Parson [R] | Sen. Mike Parson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-09 | House | Signed by Governor |
2014-05-30 | House | Delivered to Governor |
2014-05-30 | House | Signed by House Speaker |
2014-05-30 | House | Signed by Senate President Pro Tem |
2014-05-30 | House | Reported Duly Enrolled S Rules Committee |
2014-05-16 | House | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed |
2014-05-16 | House | H Third Read and Passed |
2014-05-16 | House | H recedes on HCS, as amended |
2014-05-16 | House | Bill Laid over |
2014-05-15 | House | S requests H recede & take up and pass bill |
2014-05-15 | House | S refuses to concur in HCS, as amended |
2014-05-13 | House | H Third Read and Passed |
2014-05-13 | House | HCS, as amended, H adopted |
2014-05-13 | House | HA 1 to HCS H offered & adopted (Kelly-45)--(5022H05.05H) |
2014-04-28 | House | Reported Do Pass H Fiscal Review Committee |
2014-04-28 | House | Voted Do Pass H Fiscal Review Committee |
2014-04-24 | House | Referred H Fiscal Review Committee |
2014-04-24 | House | Reported Do Pass H Rules Committee |
2014-04-24 | House | Voted Do Pass H Rules Committee |
2014-04-22 | House | Referred to H Rules Committee |
2014-04-22 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass H Budget Committee |
2014-04-22 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass H Budget Committee |
2014-04-15 | House | Hearing Conducted H Budget Committee |
2014-04-10 | House | Referred H Budget Committee |
2014-04-07 | House | H Second Read |
2014-04-03 | House | H First Read |
2014-04-03 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Reported from S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee to Floor |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Referred S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Perfected |
2014-03-27 | Senate | SCS S adopted |
2014-03-27 | Senate | SA 1 S withdrawn |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2014-03-04 | Senate | SA 1 to SCS S offered (Schaaf)--(5022S02.03S) |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Reported from S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee to Floor w/SCS |
2014-02-12 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee (5022S.02C) |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2014-01-14 | Senate | S First Read--SB 723-Parson |