MO SB721 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-19 - Voted Do Pass S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-19 - Voted Do Pass S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies requirements for guaranteed energy cost savings contracts
Title
Modifies requirements for guaranteed energy cost savings contracts
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-19 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee |
2020-01-08 | Senate | S First Read--SB 721-Hough |
2019-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/20info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=26837973 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/20info/pdf-bill/intro/SB721.pdf |