MO SB721 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-16 - Voted Do Pass S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-16 - Voted Do Pass S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies the crime of animal trespass
Title
Modifies the crime of animal trespass
Sponsors
Sen. Gary Romine [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-16 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee |
2016-01-13 | Senate | Re-referred S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee |
2016-01-11 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Agriculture, Food Production and Outdoor Resources Committee |
2016-01-06 | Senate | S First Read--SB 721-Romine |
2015-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/16info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=22246442 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/16info/pdf-bill/intro/SB721.pdf |