MO SB715 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on July 12 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-09-12 - No motion to override Governor's veto
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on July 12 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-09-12 - No motion to override Governor's veto
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Allows the Adjutant General to waive the age limit for service in the state militia and repeals a complaint procedure for the state militia
Title
Allows the Adjutant General to waive the age limit for service in the state militia and repeals a complaint procedure for the state militia
Sponsors
Rep. David Day [R] | Sen. Will Kraus [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-09-12 | No motion to override Governor's veto | |
2012-07-12 | Vetoed by Governor | |
2012-05-30 | Delivered to Governor | |
2012-05-30 | Signed by House Speaker | |
2012-05-30 | Signed by Senate President | |
2012-05-30 | Reported Duly Enrolled S Rules Committee | |
2012-05-16 | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed | |
2012-05-16 | H Third Read and Passed | |
2012-05-16 | H recedes on HA 1 & HA 2 | |
2012-05-09 | S requests H recede and take up and pass bill | |
2012-05-09 | S refuses to concur in HA 1 & HA 2 | |
2012-05-08 | H Third Read and Passed, as amended | |
2012-05-08 | HA 2 H offered & adopted (Webber)--(5607S02.11H) | |
2012-05-08 | HA 1 H offered & adopted (Allen)--(5607S02.15H) | |
2012-05-03 | Reported Do Pass H Rules Pursuant Committee | |
2012-05-03 | Voted Do Pass H Rules Pursuant Committee | |
2012-05-03 | Hearing Conducted H Rules Pursuant Committee | |
2012-04-25 | Referred to Rules Committee pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) | |
2012-04-25 | Reported Do Pass H Veterans Committee | |
2012-04-24 | Voted Do Pass H Veterans Committee | |
2012-04-24 | Hearing Conducted H Veterans Committee | |
2012-04-12 | Referred H Veterans Committee | |
2012-04-10 | H Second Read | |
2012-04-05 | H First Read | |
2012-04-05 | S Third Read and Passed | |
2012-04-04 | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules Committee | |
2012-04-04 | Perfected | |
2012-04-04 | SCS S adopted | |
2012-03-29 | Reported from S Veterans' Affairs, Emerging Issues, Pensions and Urban Affairs Committee to Floor w/SCS | |
2012-03-22 | Returned to S Veterans' Affairs, Emerging Issues, Pensions and Urban Affairs Committee | |
2012-03-22 | Reported from S Veterans' Affairs, Emerging Issues, Pensions and Urban Affairs Committee to Floor w/SCS | |
2012-03-08 | SCS Voted Do Pass S Veterans' Affairs, Emerging Issues, Pensions and Urban Affairs Committee - (5607S.02C) | |
2012-02-09 | Hearing Conducted S Veterans' Affairs, Emerging Issues, Pensions and Urban Affairs Committee | |
2012-02-02 | Second Read and Referred S Veterans' Affairs, Emerging Issues, Pensions and Urban Affairs Committee | |
2012-01-30 | S First Read--SB 715-Kraus |