MO SB71 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 3 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-05-05 - Reported Duly Enrolled Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions & Ethics Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Modifies several provisions relating to civil proceedings

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Modifies several provisions relating to civil proceedings

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-03 - House - House: SB 71 (HA 1) SBs FOR THIRD READING - INFORMAL (Y: 140 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2021-05-03 - House - House: SB 71 SBs FOR THIRD READING - INFORMAL (Y: 144 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-05SenateReported Duly Enrolled Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions & Ethics Committee
2021-05-03SenateTruly Agreed To and Finally Passed
2021-05-03HouseS Third Read and Passed
2021-05-03HouseS concurs in HCS, as amended
2021-05-03HouseH Third Read and Passed
2021-05-03HouseHCS, as amended, H adopted
2021-05-03HouseHA 1 to HCS H offered & adopted (Coleman-97)--(1081H05.09H)
2021-05-03HouseBill Placed on Informal Calendar
2021-04-28HouseHCS Reported Do Pass H Rules - Administrative Oversight
2021-04-28HouseHCS Voted Do Pass H Rules - Administrative Oversight
2021-04-27HouseReferred H Rules - Administrative Oversight
2021-04-27HouseHCS Reported Do Pass H Crime Prevention
2021-04-27HouseHCS Voted Do Pass H Crime Prevention
2021-04-27HouseCommittee vote reconsidered
2021-04-22HouseHCS Voted Do Pass H Crime Prevention
2021-04-21HouseHearing Conducted H Crime Prevention
2021-04-19HouseReferred H Crime Prevention
2021-04-19HouseH Second Read
2021-04-15HouseH First Read
2021-04-15SenateS Third Read and Passed
2021-04-14SenateReported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
2021-04-13SenatePerfected
2021-04-13SenateSS for SCS S offered & adopted (Gannon)--(1081S.03F)
2021-03-04SenateReported from S Agriculture, Food Production and Outdoor Resources Committee w/SCS
2021-03-01SenateSCS Voted Do Pass S Agriculture, Food Production and Outdoor Resources Committee (1081S.02C)
2021-02-22SenateHearing Conducted S Agriculture, Food Production and Outdoor Resources Committee
2021-02-15SenateHearing Cancelled S Agriculture, Food Production and Outdoor Resources Committee
2021-01-14SenateSecond Read and Referred S Agriculture, Food Production and Outdoor Resources Committee
2021-01-06SenateS First Read
2020-12-01SenatePrefiled

Missouri State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.senate.mo.gov/21info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=54250843
Texthttps://www.senate.mo.gov/21info/pdf-bill/intro/SB71.pdf
Texthttps://www.senate.mo.gov/21info/pdf-bill/SCSfromResearch/SB71.pdf
Texthttps://www.senate.mo.gov/21info/pdf-bill/comm/SB71.pdf
Texthttps://www.senate.mo.gov/21info/pdf-bill/perf/SB71.pdf
Texthttps://www.senate.mo.gov/21info/pdf-bill/House/HCS-SB/SB0071.pdf
Texthttps://www.senate.mo.gov/21info/pdf-bill/tat/SB71.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.senate.mo.gov/21info/BTS_Web/ShowAmendment.aspx?Id=3639
Supplementhttps://www.senate.mo.gov/21info/BTS_Web/Summary.aspx?SessionType=R&SummaryID=134051648&BillID=54250843
Supplementhttps://www.senate.mo.gov/FiscalNotes/2021-1/1081S.01I.ORG.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.senate.mo.gov/21info/BTS_Web/Summary.aspx?SessionType=R&SummaryID=138427825&BillID=54250843
Supplementhttps://www.senate.mo.gov/FiscalNotes/2021-1/1081S.02C.ORG.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.senate.mo.gov/21info/BTS_Web/Summary.aspx?SessionType=R&SummaryID=142718358&BillID=54250843
Supplementhttps://www.senate.mo.gov/FiscalNotes/2021-1/1081S.03P.ORG.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.senate.mo.gov/21info/BTS_Web/Summary.aspx?SessionType=R&SummaryID=143872397&BillID=54250843
Supplementhttps://www.senate.mo.gov/FiscalNotes/2021-1/1081H.05C.ORG.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.senate.mo.gov/21info/BTS_Web/Summary.aspx?SessionType=R&SummaryID=144575263&BillID=54250843
Supplementhttps://www.senate.mo.gov/21info/BTS_Web/Summary.aspx?SessionType=R&SummaryID=144597363&BillID=54250843
Roll Callhttps://www.senate.mo.gov/21info/Journals/RDay500415762-778.pdf#772
Roll Callhttps://www.senate.mo.gov/21info/Journals/RDay500415762-776.pdf#770
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/rollcalls/063.003.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/rollcalls/063.002.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.senate.mo.gov/21info/Journals/RDay5905031072-1105.pdf#1095

Bill Comments 750

feedback