MO SB71 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-13 - S Calendar S Bills with H Amendments--SB 71-Parson, with HSA 1 for HA 1, as amended & HA 2
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-13 - S Calendar S Bills with H Amendments--SB 71-Parson, with HSA 1 for HA 1, as amended & HA 2
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Eliminates a requirement that banks, savings institutions, and credit unions file a certain notice with the Missouri Real Estate Appraisers Commission
Title
Eliminates a requirement that banks, savings institutions, and credit unions file a certain notice with the Missouri Real Estate Appraisers Commission
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Parson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-13 | S Calendar S Bills with H Amendments--SB 71-Parson, with HSA 1 for HA 1, as amended & HA 2 | |
2011-05-11 | Motion to concur in HSA 1 for HA 1, as amended, S offered & withdrawn | |
2011-05-09 | H Third Read and Passed, as amended | |
2011-05-09 | HA 2 H offered & adopted (Nichols)--(0661S01.01L) | |
2011-05-09 | HSA 1 for HA 1, as amended, H adopted | |
2011-05-09 | HA 1 to HSA 1 for HA 1 H offered & adopted (Kelly-24)--(0661S01.01F) | |
2011-05-09 | HSA for HA 1 H offered (Diehl)--(0661S01.02L) | |
2011-05-09 | HA 1 H offered (Jones-89)--(0661S01.03H) | |
2011-05-03 | Reported Do Pass H Rules Pursuant Committee - NOT CONSENT | |
2011-05-03 | Voted Do Pass H Rules Pursuant Committee - NOT CONSENT | |
2011-04-07 | Referred to Rules Committee pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) | |
2011-04-07 | Reported Do Pass H Financial Institutions Committee - Consent | |
2011-04-07 | Voted Do Pass H Financial Institutions Committee - Consent | |
2011-04-06 | Hearing Conducted H Financial Institutions Committee | |
2011-03-31 | Referred H Financial Institutions Committee | |
2011-02-28 | H Second Read | |
2011-02-24 | H First Read | |
2011-02-24 | S Third Read and Passed | |
2011-02-22 | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules Committee | |
2011-02-21 | Perfected | |
2011-02-17 | Reported from S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee to Floor | |
2011-02-14 | Removed S Consent Calendar | |
2011-02-10 | Reported from S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee to Floor - Consent | |
2011-02-07 | Voted Do Pass S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee - Consent | |
2011-01-31 | Hearing Conducted S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee | |
2011-01-20 | Second Read and Referred S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee | |
2011-01-05 | S First Read--SB 71-Parson | |
2011-01-04 | Prefiled |