MO SB704 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-13 - H Calendar Senate Bills for Third Reading w/HCS & HCA 3
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-13 - H Calendar Senate Bills for Third Reading w/HCS & HCA 3
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Requires all departments and divisions of the state, including statewide offices, to post copies of contracts entered into for the provision of legal services from outside firms on the Missouri Accountability Portal
Title
Requires all departments and divisions of the state, including statewide offices, to post copies of contracts entered into for the provision of legal services from outside firms on the Missouri Accountability Portal
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-13 | House | H Calendar Senate Bills for Third Reading w/HCS & HCA 3 |
2016-05-11 | House | Reported Do Pass H Fiscal Review w/HCA 3 |
2016-05-11 | House | Voted Do Pass H Fiscal Review w/Amendments |
2016-05-10 | House | Referred H Fiscal Review Committee |
2016-05-09 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass H Select Committee on General Laws (Pursuant to H Rule 27.7) |
2016-05-04 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass H Select Committee on General Laws (Pursuant to H Rule 27.7) |
2016-04-13 | House | Referred H Select Committee on General Laws (Pursuant to H Rule 27.7) |
2016-04-13 | House | Reported Do Pass H Government Efficiency w/HCA 1 |
2016-04-11 | House | Voted Do Pass H Government Efficiency w/Amendments |
2016-04-04 | House | Hearing Conducted H Government Efficiency |
2016-03-30 | House | Referred H Government Efficiency |
2016-02-23 | House | H Second Read |
2016-02-22 | House | H First Read |
2016-02-18 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Perfected |
2016-02-16 | Senate | SS for SCS, as amended, S adopted |
2016-02-16 | Senate | SA 1 to SS for SCS S offered & adopted (Munzlinger)--(4101S03.02S) |
2016-02-16 | Senate | SS for SCS S offered (Munzlinger)--(4101S.03F) |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Reported from S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee w/SCS |
2016-01-27 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee (4101S.02C) |
2016-01-13 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2016-01-11 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2016-01-06 | Senate | S First Read--SB 704-Munzlinger |
2015-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |