MO SB7 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-13 - S Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SBs 7, 5, 74 & 169-Goodman, with SCS
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-13 - S Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SBs 7, 5, 74 & 169-Goodman, with SCS
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Creates the "TANF Child Protection and Drug Free Home Act" regarding drug testing for work-eligible TANF applicants and recipients
Title
Creates the "TANF Child Protection and Drug Free Home Act" regarding drug testing for work-eligible TANF applicants and recipients
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-13 | S Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SBs 7, 5, 74 & 169-Goodman, with SCS | |
2011-02-14 | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar | |
2011-02-10 | Reported from S Health, Mental Health, Seniors and Families Committee to Floor w/SCS | |
2011-02-08 | SCS Voted Do Pass (w/SCS SBs 7, 5, 74 & 169) S Health, Mental Health, Seniors and Families Committee (0131S.05C) | |
2011-01-25 | Hearing Conducted S Health, Mental Health, Seniors and Families Committee | |
2011-01-12 | Second Read and Referred S Health, Mental Health, Seniors and Families Committee | |
2011-01-05 | S First Read--SB 7-Goodman | |
2010-12-01 | Prefiled |