MO SB694 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 31 1969 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: No history available
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 31 1969 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: No history available
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes the Senior Services Growth and Development Program
Title
Establishes the Senior Services Growth and Development Program
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-07 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Seniors, Families and Children Committee |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Seniors, Families and Children Committee |
2018-01-10 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Seniors, Families and Children Committee |
2018-01-03 | Senate | S First Read--SB 694-Wallingford |
2017-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/18info/BTS_Web/Error.aspx |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/18info/pdf-bill/intro/SB694.pdf |