MO SB692 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-07 - SCS Voted Do Pass S Local Government and Elections Committee (4029S.03C)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-07 - SCS Voted Do Pass S Local Government and Elections Committee (4029S.03C)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions regarding the revenue collected from certain municipal ordinance violations and municipal court procedure
Title
Modifies provisions regarding the revenue collected from certain municipal ordinance violations and municipal court procedure
Sponsors
Sen. Ed Emery [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-07 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Local Government and Elections Committee (4029S.03C) |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Local Government and Elections Committee |
2018-01-10 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Local Government and Elections Committee |
2018-01-03 | Senate | S First Read--SB 692-Emery |
2017-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/18info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=69471972 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/18info/pdf-bill/intro/SB692.pdf |