MO SB691 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-10 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Modifies insurance policy cancellation and reinstatement requirements and allows homeowner insurance companies to offer sinkhole coverage

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Modifies insurance policy cancellation and reinstatement requirements and allows homeowner insurance companies to offer sinkhole coverage

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2014-07-10SenateSigned by Governor
2014-05-30SenateDelivered to Governor
2014-05-30SenateSigned by House Speaker
2014-05-30SenateSigned by Senate President Pro Tem
2014-05-30SenateReported Duly Enrolled S Rules Committee
2014-05-16SenateTruly Agreed To and Finally Passed
2014-05-16HouseS Third Read and Passed
2014-05-16HouseS concurs in HCS
2014-05-15HouseH Third Read and Passed
2014-05-15HouseHCS H adopted
2014-05-12HouseReported Do Pass H Rules Committee
2014-05-12HouseVoted Do Pass H Rules Committee
2014-04-30HouseReferred to H Rules Committee
2014-04-30HouseHCS Reported Do Pass H Insurance Policy Committee
2014-04-28HouseHCS Voted Do Pass H Insurance Policy Committee
2014-04-07HouseHearing Conducted H Insurance Policy Committee
2014-04-02HouseReferred H Insurance Policy Committee
2014-03-31HouseH Second Read
2014-03-27HouseH First Read
2014-03-27SenateS Third Read and Passed
2014-03-13SenateBill Placed on Informal Calendar
2014-03-11SenateReported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
2014-03-10SenatePerfected
2014-03-10SenateSS S offered & adopted (Wasson)--(4366S.02F)
2014-03-06SenateReported from S Small Business, Insurance and Industry Committee to Floor
2014-02-25SenateVoted Do Pass S Small Business, Insurance and Industry Committee
2014-02-18SenateHearing Conducted S Small Business, Insurance and Industry Committee
2014-01-30SenateSecond Read and Referred S Small Business, Insurance and Industry Committee
2014-01-09SenateS First Read--SB 691-Wasson

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback