MO SB688 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-22 - Voted Do Pass S Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-22 - Voted Do Pass S Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Reauthorizes a tax credit for certain research expenses
Title
Reauthorizes a tax credit for certain research expenses
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-22 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Economic Development Committee |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Economic Development Committee |
2022-01-10 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Economic Development Committee |
2022-01-05 | Senate | S First Read |
2021-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |