MO SB686 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-13 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 686-Wallingford, with SCS
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-13 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 686-Wallingford, with SCS
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies how fourth class cities may proceed with road improvements
Title
Modifies how fourth class cities may proceed with road improvements
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-13 | Senate | Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 686-Wallingford, with SCS |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Reported from S Jobs, Economic Development and Local Government Committee w/SCS |
2016-03-02 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Jobs, Economic Development and Local Government Committee (4718S.02C) |
2016-01-20 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Jobs, Economic Development and Local Government Committee |
2016-01-11 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Jobs, Economic Development and Local Government Committee |
2016-01-06 | Senate | S First Read--SB 686-Wallingford |
2015-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |