MO SB68 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-30 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-30 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that directors of industrial development corporations in St. Francois County may be taxpayers and registered voters in the county
Title
Provides that directors of industrial development corporations in St. Francois County may be taxpayers and registered voters in the county
Sponsors
Sen. Gary Romine [R] | Rep. Dave Hinson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-30 | House | Signed by Governor |
2015-05-27 | House | Delivered to Governor |
2015-05-27 | House | Signed by House Speaker Pro Tem |
2015-05-27 | House | Signed by Senate President Pro Tem |
2015-05-27 | House | Reported Duly Enrolled S Rules Committee |
2015-04-28 | House | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed |
2015-04-28 | House | H Third Read and Passed |
2015-04-20 | House | Reported Do Pass H Select Committee on State and Local Governments (Pursuant to H Rule 27.13) Committee |
2015-04-16 | House | Voted Do Pass H Select Committee on State and Local Governments (Pursuant to H Rule 27.13) Committee |
2015-04-14 | House | Referred H Select Committee on State and Local Governments (Pursuant to H Rule 27.13) Committee |
2015-04-14 | House | Reported Do Pass H Local Government Committee |
2015-04-14 | House | Voted Do Pass H Local Government Committee |
2015-04-07 | House | Hearing Conducted H Local Government Committee |
2015-03-31 | House | Referred H Local Government Committee |
2015-03-02 | House | H Second Read |
2015-02-26 | House | H First Read |
2015-02-26 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed - Consent |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Reported from S Jobs, Economic Development and Local Government Committee to Floor - Consent |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Motion to pass bill as consent taken by S Jobs, Economic Development and Local Government Committee - Consent vote adopted |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Jobs, Economic Development and Local Government Committee |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Jobs, Economic Development and Local Government Committee |
2015-01-22 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Jobs, Economic Development and Local Government Committee |
2015-01-07 | Senate | S First Read--SB 68-Romine |
2014-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |