MO SB678 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-25 - Voted Do Pass S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-25 - Voted Do Pass S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to lead licensing
Title
Modifies provisions relating to lead licensing
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-25 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee |
2014-01-08 | Senate | S First Read--SB 678-Curls |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/14info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=28134656 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/14info/pdf-bill/intro/SB678.pdf |