MO SB676 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 8 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-05-27 - Delivered to Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Modifies several provisions relating to taxation

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Modifies several provisions relating to taxation

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-05-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-08 - Senate - Senate: Adopt Substitute (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-08 - Senate - Senate: Adopt Substitute (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-07 - House - House: SB 676 SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 105 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2020-05-07 - House - House: SB 676 SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 147 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-27SenateDelivered to Governor
2020-05-27SenateConstitutional Objection filed in House
2020-05-27SenateSigned by House Speaker
2020-05-27SenateSigned by Senate President Pro Tem
2020-05-27SenateReported Duly Enrolled Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions & Ethics Committee
2020-05-08SenateTruly Agreed To and Finally Passed
2020-05-08HouseS Third Read and Passed
2020-05-08HouseS concurred in HCS, as amended
2020-05-07HouseH Third Read and Passed
2020-05-07HouseHCS, as amended, H adopted
2020-05-07HouseHA 1 to HCS H offered & adopted (Christofanelli)--(3183H07.16H)
2020-05-07HouseReported Do Pass H Fiscal Review
2020-05-07HouseVoted Do Pass H Fiscal Review
2020-05-05HouseReferred H Fiscal Review Committee
2020-05-04HouseReported Do Pass H Rules - Legislative Oversight
2020-05-04HouseVoted Do Pass H Rules - Legislative Oversight
2020-04-30HouseReferred H Rules - Legislative Oversight
2020-04-30HouseHCS Reported Do Pass H Ways and Means
2020-04-29HouseHCS Voted Do Pass H Ways and Means
2020-04-29HouseHearing Conducted H Ways and Means
2020-03-11HouseReferred H Ways and Means
2020-03-11HouseH Second Read
2020-03-10HouseH First Read
2020-03-10SenateS Third Read and Passed - Consent
2020-02-27SenateReported from S Ways and Means Committee - Consent
2020-02-27SenateMotion to pass bill as consent taken by S Ways and Means Committee - Consent vote adopted
2020-02-27SenateVoted Do Pass S Ways and Means Committee
2020-02-27SenateCommittee Vote Reconsidered - SCS withdrawn
2020-02-25SenateRemoved S Consent Calendar
2020-02-20SenateReported from S Ways and Means Committee w/ SCS - Consent
2020-02-13SenateMotion to pass bill as consent taken by S Ways and Means Committee - Consent vote adopted (3183S.02C)
2020-02-13SenateSCS Voted Do Pass S Ways and Means Committee (3183S.02C)
2020-02-11SenateHearing Conducted S Ways and Means Committee
2020-02-04SenateHearing Cancelled S Ways and Means Committee
2020-01-22SenateSecond Read and Referred S Ways and Means Committee
2020-01-08SenateS First Read--SB 676-Luetkemeyer
2019-12-01SenatePrefiled

Missouri State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.senate.mo.gov/20info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=26838057
Texthttps://www.senate.mo.gov/20info/pdf-bill/intro/SB676.pdf
Texthttps://www.senate.mo.gov/20info/pdf-bill/SCSfromResearch/SB676.pdf
Texthttps://www.senate.mo.gov/20info/pdf-bill/comm/SB676.pdf
Texthttps://www.senate.mo.gov/20info/pdf-bill/perf/SB676.pdf
Texthttps://www.senate.mo.gov/20info/pdf-bill/House/HCS-SB/SB0676.pdf
Texthttps://www.senate.mo.gov/20info/pdf-bill/tat/SB676.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.senate.mo.gov/20info/Journals/RDay330310495-512.pdf#504
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills201/rollcalls/058.004.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills201/rollcalls/058.003.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.senate.mo.gov/20info/Journals/RDay520508958-987.pdf#959
Roll Callhttps://www.senate.mo.gov/20info/Journals/RDay520508958-987.pdf#960
Roll Callhttps://www.senate.mo.gov/20info/Journals/RDay520508958-988.pdf#959
Roll Callhttps://www.senate.mo.gov/20info/Journals/RDay520508958-988.pdf#960

Bill Comments

feedback