MO SB674 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-16 - H Calendar S Bills for Third Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-16 - H Calendar S Bills for Third Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes the Missouri State Capitol Commission and the Office of Administration to enter into contracts for events held at the State Capitol and the Missouri State Penitentiary historic site
Title
Authorizes the Missouri State Capitol Commission and the Office of Administration to enter into contracts for events held at the State Capitol and the Missouri State Penitentiary historic site
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Kehoe [R] | Rep. Tom Flanigan [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-16 | House | H Calendar S Bills for Third Reading |
2014-05-06 | House | Reported Do Pass H Rules Committee |
2014-05-06 | House | Voted Do Pass H Rules Committee |
2014-04-30 | House | Referred to H Rules Committee |
2014-04-30 | House | Reported Do Pass H Special Standing Committee on Corrections Committee |
2014-04-30 | House | Voted Do Pass H Special Standing Committee on Corrections Committee |
2014-04-30 | House | Hearing Conducted H Special Standing Committee on Corrections Committee |
2014-04-22 | House | Referred H Special Standing Committee on Corrections Committee |
2014-04-03 | House | H Second Read |
2014-04-02 | House | H First Read |
2014-04-02 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Perfected |
2014-04-01 | Senate | SA 1 S offered & defeated (Emery)--(4233S02.01S) |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Reported from S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee to Floor |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Removed S Consent Calendar |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Reported from S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee to Floor-Consent |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Motion to pass bill as consent taken by S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee - Consent vote adopted |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2014-01-08 | Senate | S First Read--SB 674-Kehoe |