MO SB674 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-02-09 - Hearing Conducted S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy And The Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-02-09 - Hearing Conducted S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy And The Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits public utilities from requiring a deposit from certain delinquent customers
Title
Prohibits public utilities from requiring a deposit from certain delinquent customers
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-09 | Hearing Conducted S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee | |
2010-01-13 | Second Read and Referred S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee | |
2010-01-06 | S First Read--SB 674-Wright-Jones | |
2009-12-01 | Prefiled |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/10info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=3157517 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/10info/pdf-bill/intro/SB674.pdf |