MO SB665 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 24 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-24 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 24 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-24 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to agriculture
Title
Modifies provisions relating to agriculture
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-05 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-05 - Senate - Senate: Adopt Substitute (Y: 26 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-28 - House - House: SB 665 SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 117 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-05-05 - Senate - Senate: Adopt Substitute (Y: 26 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-28 - House - House: SB 665 SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 117 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-24 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Delivered to Governor |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Signed by House Speaker |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Signed by Senate President Pro Tem |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Reported Duly Enrolled Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions & Ethics Committee |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed |
2016-05-05 | House | S Third Read and Passed |
2016-05-05 | House | S concurs in HCS, as amended |
2016-04-28 | House | H Third Read and Passed |
2016-04-28 | House | HCS, as amended, H adopted |
2016-04-28 | House | HA 1 to HCS H offered & adopted (Hummel)--(4848H02.01H) |
2016-04-28 | House | Reported from H Fiscal Review |
2016-04-27 | House | Voted Do Pass H Fiscal Review |
2016-04-26 | House | Referred H Fiscal Review Committee |
2016-04-25 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass H Select Committee on Agriculture (Pursuant to H Rule 27.2) |
2016-04-20 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass H Select Committee on Agriculture (Pursuant to H Rule 27.2) |
2016-04-12 | House | Referred H Select Committee on Agriculture (Pursuant to H Rule 27.2) |
2016-04-12 | House | Reported Do Pass H Agriculture Policy |
2016-04-11 | House | Voted Do Pass H Agriculture Policy |
2016-04-05 | House | Hearing Conducted H Agriculture Policy |
2016-03-30 | House | Referred H Agriculture Policy |
2016-02-29 | House | H Second Read |
2016-02-25 | House | H First Read |
2016-02-25 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Perfected |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Reported from S Agriculture, Food Production and Outdoor Resources Committee |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Removed S Consent Calendar |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Reported from S Agriculture, Food Production and Outdoor Resources Committee - Consent |
2016-01-26 | Senate | Motion to pass bill as consent taken by S Agriculture, Food Production and Outdoor Resources Committee - Consent vote adopted |
2016-01-26 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Agriculture, Food Production and Outdoor Resources Committee |
2016-01-20 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Agriculture, Food Production and Outdoor Resources Committee |
2016-01-11 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Agriculture, Food Production and Outdoor Resources Committee |
2016-01-06 | Senate | S First Read--SB 665-Parson |
2015-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |