MO SB662 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-13 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SCS for SBs 662 & 587-Dixon
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-13 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SCS for SBs 662 & 587-Dixon
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Adopts the Compact for a Balanced Budget
Title
Adopts the Compact for a Balanced Budget
Sponsors
Sen. Bob Dixon [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-13 | Senate | Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SCS for SBs 662 & 587-Dixon |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2016-05-04 | Senate | SCS S adopted |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2016-04-04 | Senate | Journal Correction to reflect SCS for SB 662 & SB 587 |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Reported from S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee, with SCS |
2016-03-29 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass (w/SCS SBs 662 & 587) Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee (5047S.02C) |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2016-01-11 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2016-01-06 | Senate | S First Read--SB 662-Dixon |
2015-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |