MO SB656 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-14 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Modifies provisions relating to veterans

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Modifies provisions relating to veterans

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-05-13 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-13 - Senate - Senate: Adopt Substitute (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-12 - House - House: SB 656 SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 149 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-14SenateSigned by Governor
2020-05-27SenateDelivered to Governor
2020-05-27SenateConstitutional Objection filed in House
2020-05-27SenateSigned by House Speaker
2020-05-27SenateSigned by Senate President Pro Tem
2020-05-27SenateReported Duly Enrolled Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions & Ethics Committee
2020-05-13SenateTruly Agreed To and Finally Passed
2020-05-13HouseS Third Read and Passed
2020-05-13HouseS concurs in HCS, as amended
2020-05-12HouseH Third Read and Passed
2020-05-12HouseHCS, as amended, H adopted
2020-05-12HouseHA 4 to HCS H offered & adopted (Schroer)--(3185H04.08H)
2020-05-12HouseHA 3 to HCS H offered & adopted (Sommer)--(3185H04.05H)
2020-05-12HouseHA 2 to HCS H offered & adopted (Morse-151)--(3185H04.07H)
2020-05-12HouseHA 1 to HCS H offered & adopted (Haffner)--(3185H04.04H)
2020-05-11HouseReported Do Pass H Fiscal Review
2020-05-11HouseVoted Do Pass H Fiscal Review
2020-05-08HouseReferred H Fiscal Review Committee
2020-05-08HouseReported Do Pass H Rules - Administrative Oversight
2020-05-08HouseVoted Do Pass H Rules - Administrative Oversight
2020-05-06HouseReferred H Rules - Administrative Oversight
2020-05-06HouseHCS Reported Do Pass H Veterans
2020-05-04HouseHCS Voted Do Pass H Veterans
2020-03-11HouseHearing Conducted H Veterans
2020-03-05HouseReferred H Veterans
2020-03-04HouseH Second Read
2020-03-03HouseH First Read
2020-03-02SenateS Third Read and Passed - Consent
2020-02-13SenateReported from S Veterans and Military Affairs Committee - Consent
2020-02-04SenateMotion to pass bill as consent taken by S Veterans and Military Affairs Committee - Consent vote adopted
2020-02-04SenateVoted Do Pass S Veterans and Military Affairs Committee
2020-01-28SenateHearing Conducted S Veterans and Military Affairs Committee
2020-01-22SenateSecond Read and Referred S Veterans and Military Affairs Committee
2020-01-08SenateS First Read--SB 656-Cierpiot
2019-12-01SenatePrefiled

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback