MO SB656 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 14 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-14 - Legislature voted to override Governor's veto
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Modifies provisions relating to county sheriffs, self defense, unlawful use of weapons, and concealed carry permits

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Modifies provisions relating to county sheriffs, self defense, unlawful use of weapons, and concealed carry permits

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-09-14 - House - House: SB 656 Vetoed Senate Bills (Y: 112 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2016-05-13 - House - House: SB 656 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 111 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2016-05-13 - House - House: SB 656 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 120 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2016-05-13 - House - House: SB 656 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 114 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2016-05-13 - House - House: SB 656 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 115 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2016-05-05 - House - House: SB 656 SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 104 N: 24 NV: 1 Abs: 33) [PASS]
2016-05-05 - House - House: SB 656 (HA 2) SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 88 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 46) [PASS]
2016-05-05 - House - House: SB 656 (*HA 1 HA 5) SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 92 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 36) [PASS]
2016-05-05 - House - House: SB 656 SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 94 N: 26 NV: 1 Abs: 41) [PASS]
2016-05-05 - House - House: SB 656 SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 101 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 33) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-09-14SenateLegislature voted to override Governor's veto
2016-09-14SenateMotion to override Governor's veto H adopted
2016-09-14SenateMotion to override Governor's veto S adopted (Munzlinger)
2016-06-27SenateVetoed by Governor
2016-05-25SenateDelivered to Governor
2016-05-25SenateSigned by House Speaker
2016-05-25SenateSigned by Senate President Pro Tem
2016-05-25SenateReported Duly Enrolled Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions & Ethics Committee
2016-05-13SenateTruly Agreed To and Finally Passed
2016-05-13SenateCCS H Third Read and Passed - EC adopted
2016-05-13SenateH adopts CCR
2016-05-13HouseCCS S Third Read and Passed - EC adopted--(4337S.07S)
2016-05-13HouseCCR S offered & adopted--(4337S07.1SR)
2016-05-13HouseReported Do Pass H Fiscal Review
2016-05-13HouseVoted Do Pass H Fiscal Review
2016-05-12HouseReferred H Fiscal Review Committee
2016-05-12HouseH distributes CCR
2016-05-09HouseS conferees appointed: Munzlinger, Onder, Riddle, Schupp, Nasheed
2016-05-09HouseH conferees appointed: Burlison, Ross, Taylor(139), Morgan, Newman
2016-05-09HouseH refuses to recede and grants conference
2016-05-06HouseS refuses to concur in HCS, as amended and requests H recede or grant conference
2016-05-05HouseH Third Read and Passed - EC defeated
2016-05-05HouseHCS, as amended, H adopted
2016-05-05HouseHA 5 to HCS, as amended, H adopted
2016-05-05HouseHA 1 to HA 5 to HCS H offered & adopted (McGaugh)--(4337H04.14H)
2016-05-05HouseHA 5 to HCS H offered (Ross)--(4337H04.13H)
2016-05-05HouseHA 4 to HCS H offered & adopted (Roden)--(4337H04.02H)
2016-05-05HouseHA 3 to HCS H adopted
2016-05-05HouseHA 1 to HA 3 to HCS H offered & defeated (LaFaver)--(4337H04.09H)
2016-05-05HouseHA 3 to HCS H offered (Hicks)--(4337H04.06H)
2016-05-05HouseHA 2 to HCS H offered & adopted (Taylor)--(4337H04.07H)
2016-05-05HouseHA 1 to HCS H offered & adopted (Burlison)--(4337H04.08H)
2016-05-02HouseHCS Reported Do Pass H Select Committee on General Laws (Pursuant to H Rule 27.7)
2016-04-28HouseHCS Voted Do Pass H Select Committee on General Laws (Pursuant to H Rule 27.7)
2016-04-21HouseReferred H Select Committee on General Laws (Pursuant to H Rule 27.7)
2016-04-21HouseReported Do Pass H Emerging Issues
2016-04-20HouseVoted Do Pass H Emerging Issues
2016-04-11HouseHearing Conducted H Emerging Issues
2016-03-30HouseReferred H Emerging Issues
2016-02-29HouseH Second Read
2016-02-25HouseH First Read
2016-02-25SenateS Third Read and Passed
2016-02-22SenateReported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
2016-02-22SenatePerfected, as amended
2016-02-22SenateSA 1 S offered & adopted (Munzlinger)--(4337S02.04S)
2016-01-28SenateReported from S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee
2016-01-27SenateVoted Do Pass S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee
2016-01-20SenateHearing Conducted S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee
2016-01-07SenateSecond Read and Referred S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee
2016-01-06SenateS First Read--SB 656-Munzlinger
2015-12-01SenatePrefiled

Missouri State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.senate.mo.gov/16info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=22246426
Texthttps://www.senate.mo.gov/16info/pdf-bill/intro/SB656.pdf
Texthttps://www.senate.mo.gov/16info/pdf-bill/perf/SB656.pdf
Texthttps://www.senate.mo.gov/16info/pdf-bill/House/HCS-SB/SB0656.pdf
Texthttps://www.senate.mo.gov/16info/pdf-bill/tat/SB656.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.senate.mo.gov/16info/Journals/RDay290225395-417.pdf#402
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills161/rollcalls/065.020.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills161/rollcalls/065.019.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills161/rollcalls/065.018.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills161/rollcalls/065.017.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills161/rollcalls/065.021.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills161/rollcalls/071.083.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills161/rollcalls/071.084.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills161/rollcalls/071.085.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills161/rollcalls/071.082.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills161/rollcalls/073.018.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback