MO SB656 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-18 - S Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 656-Lager and Dixon, with SCS
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Modifies the law with respect to how municipalities and the legal system treat the lawful use of motor vehicles on public roads and modifies the commercial zone surrounding Kansas City

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Modifies the law with respect to how municipalities and the legal system treat the lawful use of motor vehicles on public roads and modifies the commercial zone surrounding Kansas City

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2012-05-18 S Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 656-Lager and Dixon, with SCS
2012-03-26 Bill Placed on Informal Calendar
2012-03-22 Reported from S Transportation Committee to Floor w/SCS
2012-02-15 SCS Voted Do Pass S Transportation Committee - (5249S.02C)
2012-02-08 Hearing Conducted S Transportation Committee
2012-02-02 Second Read and Referred S Transportation Committee
2012-01-12 S First Read--SB 656-Lager and Dixon

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback