MO SB655 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-13 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Increases the minimum age for marriage from 15 to 16 years, modifies the sex offender registry system, and eliminates the statute of limitations for sexual offenses committed against minors

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Increases the minimum age for marriage from 15 to 16 years, modifies the sex offender registry system, and eliminates the statute of limitations for sexual offenses committed against minors

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-18 - House - House: SB 655 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 136 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2018-05-18 - House - House: SB 655 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 135 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 23) [PASS]
2018-05-16 - House - House: SB 655 SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 126 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 24) [PASS]
2018-04-19 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-13SenateSigned by Governor
2018-05-30SenateDelivered to Governor
2018-05-30SenateSigned by House Speaker
2018-05-30SenateSigned by Senate President Pro Tem
2018-05-30SenateReported Duly Enrolled Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions & Ethics Committee
2018-05-18SenateTruly Agreed To and Finally Passed
2018-05-18SenateCCS H Third Read and Passed
2018-05-18SenateH adopts CCR
2018-05-17SenateReported Do Pass H Fiscal Review
2018-05-17SenateVoted Do Pass H Fiscal Review
2018-05-17SenateReferred H Fiscal Review
2018-05-17SenateH distributes CCR (4429S03.01F)
2018-05-17HouseCCS S Third Read and Passed
2018-05-17HouseCCR S offered & adopted (Sifton)
2018-05-17HouseSenate conferees appointed: Sifton, Rizzo, Dixon, Emery, Koenig
2018-05-17HouseHouse conferees appointed: Bahr, Corlew, Evans, Ellebracht, Washington
2018-05-17HouseH refuses to recede and grants conference
2018-05-16HouseS refuses to concur in HCS, as amended, and requests H recede or grant conference
2018-05-16HouseH Third Read and Passed
2018-05-16HouseHCS, as amended, H adopted
2018-05-16HouseHA 3 to HCS H offered & adopted (Evans)--(4429H02.03H)
2018-05-16HouseHA 2 to HCS H offered & adopted (Bahr)--(4429H02.01H)
2018-05-16HouseHA 1 to HCS H offered & adopted (Bahr)--(4429H02.02H)
2018-05-11HouseHCS Reported Do Pass H Rules - Legislative Oversight
2018-05-09HouseVoted Do Pass H Rules - Legislative Oversight
2018-05-03HouseReferred H Rules - Legislative Oversight
2018-05-03HouseHCS Reported Do Pass H Judiciary
2018-05-01HouseHCS Voted Do Pass H Judiciary
2018-05-01HouseHearing Conducted H Judiciary
2018-04-26HouseReferred H Judiciary
2018-04-23HouseH Second Read
2018-04-19HouseH First Read
2018-04-19SenateS Third Read and Passed
2018-04-18SenateReported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
2018-04-17SenatePerfected
2018-04-05SenateReported from S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee
2018-02-22SenateVoted Do Pass S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee
2018-01-29SenateHearing Conducted S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee
2018-01-10SenateSecond Read and Referred S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee
2018-01-03SenateS First Read--SB 655-Sifton
2017-12-01SenatePrefiled

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback