MO SB65 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-17 - S Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 65-Dixon, with SCS
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Modifies the duties and authority of the State Auditor

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Modifies the duties and authority of the State Auditor

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-05-17SenateS Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 65-Dixon, with SCS
2013-03-25SenateBill Placed on Informal Calendar
2013-03-07SenateReported from S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee to Floor w/SCS
2013-02-25SenateSCS Voted Do Pass S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee - (0062S.03C)
2013-02-11SenateHearing Conducted S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee
2013-01-17SenateSecond Read and Referred S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee
2013-01-09SenateS First Read--SB 65-Dixon
2012-12-07SenatePrefiled

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback