MO SB65 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 12 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-07-14 - Governor took no action, sent to Secretary of State/Article III, Sec. 31
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Modifies provisions relating to abortion with respect to viability

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Modifies provisions relating to abortion with respect to viability

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2011-07-14 Governor took no action, sent to Secretary of State/Article III, Sec. 31
2011-05-26 Delivered to Governor
2011-05-26 Signed by House Speaker
2011-05-26 Signed by Senate President
2011-05-26 Reported Duly Enrolled S Rules Committee
2011-05-12 Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed
2011-05-12 H Third Read and Passed
2011-05-05 Reported Do Pass H Fiscal Review Committee
2011-05-05 Voted Do Pass H Fiscal Review Committee
2011-05-04 Referred H Fiscal Review Committee
2011-05-04 Reported Do Pass H Rules Pursuant Committee
2011-05-04 Voted Do Pass H Rules Pursuant Committee
2011-04-27 Referred to Rules Committee pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f)
2011-04-27 Reported Do Pass H Health Care Policy Committee
2011-04-27 Voted Do Pass H Health Care Policy Committee
2011-04-27 Hearing Conducted H Health Care Policy Committee
2011-04-20 Hearing Conducted H Health Care Policy Committee
2011-04-12 Referred H Health Care Policy Committee
2011-04-11 H Second Read
2011-04-07 H First Read
2011-04-07 S Third Read and Passed
2011-04-07 Reported from S Ways & Means and Fiscal Oversight Committee to Floor
2011-04-04 Voted Do Pass S Ways & Means and Fiscal Oversight Committee
2011-04-04 Hearing Conducted S Ways and Means and Fiscal Oversight Committee
2011-03-30 Referred S Ways & Means and Fiscal Oversight Committee
2011-03-30 Reported Truly Perfected S Rules Committee
2011-03-30 Perfected
2011-03-30 SS for SCS S offered & adopted (Mayer)--(0511S.05F)
2011-03-30 SA 2 to SCS S withdrawn
2011-03-29 Bill Placed on Informal Calendar
2011-03-29 SA 2 to SCS S offered (Justus)--(0511S04.07S)
2011-03-29 SA 1 to SCS S offered & adopted (Justus)--(05115S04.10S)
2011-03-16 Bill Placed on Informal Calendar
2011-03-10 Reported from S General Laws Committee to Floor w/SCS
2011-03-08 SCS Voted Do Pass S General Laws Committee - (0511S.04C)
2011-02-22 Hearing Conducted S General Laws Committee
2011-01-20 Second Read and Referred S General Laws Committee
2011-01-05 S First Read--SB 65-Mayer, et al
2010-12-30 Prefiled

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback