MO SB648 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-11 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-11 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions related to the virtual school program
Title
Modifies provisions related to the virtual school program
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-11 | Senate | Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Reported from S Education Committee |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Education Committee |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Education Committee |
2022-01-10 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Education Committee |
2022-01-05 | Senate | S First Read |
2021-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |