MO SB648 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-07 - Second Read and Referred S Veterans' Affairs and Health Committee
Pending: Senate Veterans' Affairs and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-07 - Second Read and Referred S Veterans' Affairs and Health Committee
Pending: Senate Veterans' Affairs and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for the expansion of MO HealthNet services beginning January 1, 2017
Title
Provides for the expansion of MO HealthNet services beginning January 1, 2017
Sponsors
Sen. Jill Schupp [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-07 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Veterans' Affairs and Health Committee |
2016-01-06 | Senate | S First Read--SB 648-Schupp |
2015-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/16info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=22246558 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/16info/pdf-bill/intro/SB648.pdf |