MO SB64 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-01 - Hearing Conducted S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy And The Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-01 - Hearing Conducted S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy And The Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits beer manufacturers from having any interest in liquor wholesalers
Title
Prohibits beer manufacturers from having any interest in liquor wholesalers
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Parson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-01 | Hearing Conducted S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee | |
2011-01-20 | Second Read and Referred S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee | |
2011-01-05 | S First Read--SB 64-Parson | |
2010-12-29 | Prefiled |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/11info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=4066492 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/11info/pdf-bill/intro/SB64.pdf |