MO SB639 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-01 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-01 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requires mammography facilities to provide to patients certain information regarding breast density
Title
Requires mammography facilities to provide to patients certain information regarding breast density
Sponsors
Sen. Dan Brown [R] | Rep. Sue Allen [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-01 | House | Signed by Governor |
2014-05-30 | House | Delivered to Governor |
2014-05-30 | House | Signed by House Speaker |
2014-05-30 | House | Signed by Senate President Pro Tem |
2014-05-30 | House | Reported Duly Enrolled S Rules Committee |
2014-05-05 | House | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed |
2014-05-05 | House | H Third Read and Passed |
2014-04-28 | House | Reported Do Pass H Rules Committee |
2014-04-28 | House | Voted Do Pass H Rules Committee |
2014-04-23 | House | Referred to H Rules Committee |
2014-04-23 | House | Reported Do Pass H General Laws Committee |
2014-04-17 | House | Voted Do Pass H General Laws Committee |
2014-04-01 | House | Hearing Conducted H General Laws Committee |
2014-03-26 | House | Referred H General Laws Committee |
2014-02-10 | House | H Second Read |
2014-02-06 | House | H First Read |
2014-02-06 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed - Consent |
2014-02-06 | Senate | SCS S adopted |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Reported from S Veterans' Affairs and Health Committee to Floor w/SCS-Consent |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Motion to pass bill as consent taken by S Veterans' Affairs and Health Committee - Consent vote adopted (4927S.02C) |
2014-01-30 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Veterans' Affairs and Health Committee (4927S.02C) |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Veterans' Affairs and Health Committee |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Veterans' Affairs and Health Committee |
2014-01-08 | Senate | S First Read--SB 639-Brown |
2013-12-19 | Senate | Prefiled |