MO SB635 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 1 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-01 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 1 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-01 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits issuance of certain incentives to business relocating from certain counties in Kansas if Kansas enacts a similar prohibition
Title
Prohibits issuance of certain incentives to business relocating from certain counties in Kansas if Kansas enacts a similar prohibition
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-01 | House | Signed by Governor |
2014-05-30 | House | Delivered to Governor |
2014-05-30 | House | Signed by House Speaker |
2014-05-30 | House | Signed by Senate President Pro Tem |
2014-05-30 | House | Reported Duly Enrolled S Rules Committee |
2014-05-14 | House | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed |
2014-05-14 | House | H Third Read and Passed |
2014-05-01 | House | Reported Do Pass H Rules Committee |
2014-05-01 | House | Voted Do Pass H Rules Committee |
2014-04-24 | House | Referred to H Rules Committee |
2014-04-24 | House | Reported Do Pass H Special Standing Committee on Small Business Committee |
2014-04-24 | House | Voted Do Pass H Special Standing Committee on Small Business Committee |
2014-04-16 | House | Hearing Conducted H Special Standing Committee on Small Business Committee |
2014-03-26 | House | Referred H Special Standing Committee on Small Business Committee |
2014-03-03 | House | H Second Read |
2014-02-27 | House | H First Read |
2014-02-27 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Perfected |
2014-02-26 | Senate | SCS, as amended, S adopted |
2014-02-26 | Senate | SA 1 to SCS S offered & adopted (Silvey)--(4370S04.01S) |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Reported from S Jobs, Economic Development and Local Government Committee to Floor w/SCS |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Removed S Consent Calendar |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Reported from S Jobs, Economic Development and Local Government Committee to Floor w/SCS - Consent |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Motion to pass bill as consent taken by S Jobs, Economic Development and Local Government Committee - Consent vote adopted (4370S.04C) |
2014-02-19 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Jobs, Economic Development and Local Government Committee (4370S.04C) |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Jobs, Economic Development and Local Government Committee |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Jobs, Economic Development and Local Government Committee |
2014-01-08 | Senate | S First Read--SB 635-Silvey and Holsman |
2013-12-17 | Senate | Prefiled |