MO SB625 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-11 - Dropped from Calendar - Pursuant to House Rules
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Modifies certain sales and use tax exemptions

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Modifies certain sales and use tax exemptions

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-11HouseDropped from Calendar - Pursuant to House Rules
2018-04-26HouseBill placed on Informal Calendar
2018-04-18HouseReported Do Pass H Rules - Legislative Oversight
2018-04-18HouseVoted Do Pass H Rules - Legislative Oversight
2018-04-10HouseReferred H Rules - Legislative Oversight
2018-04-10HouseReported Do Pass H General Laws
2018-04-09HouseVoted Do Pass H General Laws
2018-03-26HouseHearing Conducted H General Laws
2018-03-01HouseReferred H General Laws
2018-02-27HouseH Second Read
2018-02-26HouseH First Read
2018-02-22SenateS Third Read and Passed
2018-02-21SenateReported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
2018-02-21SenatePerfected
2018-02-01SenateReported from S Ways and Means Committee
2018-01-30SenateVoted Do Pass S Ways and Means Committee
2018-01-23SenateHearing Conducted S Ways and Means Committee
2018-01-09SenateSecond Read and Referred S Ways and Means Committee
2018-01-03SenateS First Read--SB 625-Cierpiot
2017-12-01SenatePrefiled

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback