MO SB614 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-16 - In Conference--SB 614-Dixon, with HCS, as amended
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Modifies the county description of Jefferson County in provisions of law which allow the county to prosecute certain violations in a county municipal court and provisions of law regarding judicial personnel

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Modifies the county description of Jefferson County in provisions of law which allow the county to prosecute certain violations in a county municipal court and provisions of law regarding judicial personnel

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2014-05-16HouseIn Conference--SB 614-Dixon, with HCS, as amended
2014-05-08HouseS conferees appointed: Dixon, Schmitt, Emery, Justus, Keaveny
2014-05-08HouseH conferees appointed: Cox, Cornejo, Kelly-45
2014-05-08HouseH refuses to recede and grants conference
2014-05-07HouseS requests H recede or grant conference
2014-05-07HouseS refuses to concur in HCS, as amended
2014-05-06HouseH Third Read and Passed, as amended
2014-05-06HouseHCS, as amended, H adopted
2014-05-06HouseHA 3 to HCS H offered & adopted (Webber)--(4247H02.09H)
2014-05-06HouseHA 2 to HCS H offered & adopted (Jones-50)--(4247H02.13H)
2014-05-06HouseHA 1 to HCS H offered & adopted (Austin)--(4247H02.04H)
2014-04-28HouseReported Do Pass H Rules Committee
2014-04-28HouseVoted Do Pass H Rules Committee
2014-04-22HouseReferred to H Rules Committee
2014-04-22HouseHCS Reported Do Pass H Judiciary Committee
2014-04-16HouseHCS Voted Do Pass H Judiciary Committee
2014-04-09HouseHearing Conducted H Judiciary Committee
2014-04-01HouseReferred H Judiciary Committee
2014-02-24HouseH Second Read
2014-02-20HouseH First Read
2014-02-20SenateS Third Read and Passed - Consent
2014-02-13SenateReported from S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee to Floor-Consent
2014-02-10SenateMotion to pass bill as consent taken by S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee - Consent vote adopted
2014-02-10SenateVoted Do Pass S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee
2014-02-03SenateHearing Conducted S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee
2014-01-23SenateSecond Read and Referred S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee
2014-01-08SenateS First Read--SB 614-Dixon
2013-12-06SenatePrefiled

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback