MO SB608 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 8 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-19 - Hearing Conducted S Progress and Development Committee
Pending: Senate Progress And Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-19 - Hearing Conducted S Progress and Development Committee
Pending: Senate Progress And Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits the gathering of intelligence about a person unless there is evidence of criminal activity and requires warrants to search curbside garbage that is awaiting collection
Title
Prohibits the gathering of intelligence about a person unless there is evidence of criminal activity and requires warrants to search curbside garbage that is awaiting collection
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-19 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Progress and Development Committee |
2014-01-16 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Progress and Development Committee |
2014-01-08 | Senate | S First Read--SB 608-Holsman |
2013-12-04 | Senate | Prefiled |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/14info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=27723636 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/14info/pdf-bill/intro/SB608.pdf |