MO SB607 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on July 12 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-09-12 - No motion to override Governor's veto
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on July 12 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-09-12 - No motion to override Governor's veto
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes procedure for resetting billboards during periods of highway construction
Title
Establishes procedure for resetting billboards during periods of highway construction
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-09-12 | No motion to override Governor's veto | |
2012-07-12 | Vetoed by Governor | |
2012-05-30 | Delivered to Governor | |
2012-05-30 | Signed by House Speaker | |
2012-05-30 | Signed by Senate President | |
2012-05-30 | Reported Duly Enrolled S Rules Committee | |
2012-05-15 | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed | |
2012-05-15 | H Third Read and Passed | |
2012-05-08 | Laid over | |
2012-05-08 | Taken up for Third Reading | |
2012-05-01 | Reported Do Pass H Rules Pursuant Committee | |
2012-05-01 | Voted Do Pass H Rules Pursuant Committee | |
2012-04-26 | Voted to return bill to committee of origin H Rules Pursuant Committee | |
2012-04-19 | Voted Do Pass H Rules Pursuant Committee | |
2012-04-11 | Referred to Rules Committee pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) | |
2012-04-11 | Reported Do Pass H Transportation Committee | |
2012-04-10 | Voted Do Pass H Transportation Committee | |
2012-04-10 | Hearing Conducted H Transportation Committee | |
2012-04-04 | Referred H Transportation Committee | |
2012-03-19 | H Second Read | |
2012-03-08 | H First Read | |
2012-03-08 | S Third Read and Passed | |
2012-03-07 | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules Committee | |
2012-03-07 | Perfected | |
2012-03-07 | SS S offered & adopted (Stouffer)--(4942S.04F) | |
2012-03-01 | Reported from S Transportation Committee to Floor | |
2012-02-08 | Voted Do Pass S Transportation Committee | |
2012-02-01 | Hearing Conducted S Transportation Committee | |
2012-01-26 | Second Read and Referred S Transportation Committee | |
2012-01-05 | S First Read--SB 607-Stouffer |