MO SB600 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 6 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-06 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 6 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-06 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to dangerous felonies
Title
Modifies provisions relating to dangerous felonies
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-15 - House - House: SB 600 SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 105 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2020-05-15 - House - House: SB 600 SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 97 N: 51 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2020-05-05 - House - House: SB 600 (HA 8, A.A.) SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 102 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2020-05-05 - House - House: SB 600 (*HA 8, A.A.) SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 103 N: 43 NV: 1 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2020-05-05 - House - House: SB 600 (HA 11) SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 94 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 29) [PASS]
2020-05-05 - House - House: SB 600 (*HA 9) SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 90 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 33) [PASS]
2020-05-05 - House - House: SB 600 (HA 12) SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 88 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 35) [PASS]
2020-05-05 - House - House: SB 600 (HA 10) SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 93 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 30) [PASS]
2020-05-05 - House - House: SB 600 (*HA 9) SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 72 N: 70 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2020-05-05 - House - House: SB 600 (HA 2, A.A.) SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 104 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2020-05-05 - House - House: SB 600 (HA 1 HA 4) SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 101 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2020-05-05 - House - House: SB 600 (*HA 4, A.A.) SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 101 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2020-05-05 - House - House: SB 600 (*HA 4, A.A.) SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 103 N: 44 NV: 4 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-05-15 - House - House: SB 600 SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 97 N: 51 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2020-05-05 - House - House: SB 600 (HA 8, A.A.) SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 102 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2020-05-05 - House - House: SB 600 (*HA 8, A.A.) SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 103 N: 43 NV: 1 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2020-05-05 - House - House: SB 600 (HA 11) SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 94 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 29) [PASS]
2020-05-05 - House - House: SB 600 (*HA 9) SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 90 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 33) [PASS]
2020-05-05 - House - House: SB 600 (HA 12) SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 88 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 35) [PASS]
2020-05-05 - House - House: SB 600 (HA 10) SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 93 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 30) [PASS]
2020-05-05 - House - House: SB 600 (*HA 9) SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 72 N: 70 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2020-05-05 - House - House: SB 600 (HA 2, A.A.) SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 104 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2020-05-05 - House - House: SB 600 (HA 1 HA 4) SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 101 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2020-05-05 - House - House: SB 600 (*HA 4, A.A.) SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 101 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2020-05-05 - House - House: SB 600 (*HA 4, A.A.) SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 103 N: 44 NV: 4 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-06 | House | Signed by Governor |
2020-05-27 | House | Delivered to Governor |
2020-05-27 | House | Signed by House Speaker |
2020-05-27 | House | Signed by Senate President Pro Tem |
2020-05-27 | House | Reported Duly Enrolled Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions & Ethics Committee |
2020-05-15 | House | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed |
2020-05-15 | House | H Third Read and Passed |
2020-05-15 | House | HCS, as amended, H defeated |
2020-05-05 | House | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2020-05-05 | House | HA 13 to HCS H offered & adopted (Mayhew)--(3178H10.32H) |
2020-05-05 | House | HA 12 to HCS H offered & adopted (Ross)--(3178H10.45H) |
2020-05-05 | House | HA 11 to HCS H offered & adopted (Ruth)--(3178H10.03H) |
2020-05-05 | House | HA 10 to HCS H adopted--(3178H10.13H) |
2020-05-05 | House | HA 1 to HA 10 to HCS H offered & ruled out of order (Razer)--(3178H10.66H) |
2020-05-05 | House | HA 10 to HCS H offered (Coleman)--(3178H10.13H) |
2020-05-05 | House | HA 9 to HCS H offered & adopted (Baker)--(3178H10.34H) |
2020-05-05 | House | HA 8 to HCS, as amended, H adopted--(3178H10.15H) |
2020-05-05 | House | HA 2 to HA 8 to HCS H offered & adopted (Hill)--(3178H10.70H) |
2020-05-05 | House | HA 1 to HA 8 to HCS H offered & withdrawn (Basye)--(3178H10.62H) |
2020-05-05 | House | HA 8 to HCS H offered (Taylor)--(3178H10.15H) |
2020-05-05 | House | HA 7 to HCS H offered & adopted (Rehder)--(3178H10.02H) |
2020-05-05 | House | HA 6 to HCS, as amended, H adopted--(3178H10.47H) |
2020-05-05 | House | HA 3 to HA 6 to HCS H offered & adopted (Christofanelli)--3178H10.63H) |
2020-05-05 | House | HA 2 to HA 6 to HCS H offered & adopted (Baker)--(3178H10.60H) |
2020-05-05 | House | HA 1 to HA 6 to HCS H offered & defeated (Merideth)--(3178H10.56H) |
2020-05-05 | House | HA 6 to HCS H offered (Roberts)--(3178H10.47H) |
2020-05-05 | House | HA 5 to HCS H offered & adopted (Veit)--(3178H10.04H) |
2020-05-05 | House | HA 4 to HCS, as amended, H adopted--(3178H10.14H) |
2020-05-05 | House | HA 1 to HA 4 to HCS H offered & adopted (Lovasco)--(3178H10.58H) |
2020-05-05 | House | HA 4 to HCS H offered (Taylor)--(3178H10.14H) |
2020-05-05 | House | HA 3 to HCS H offered & adopted (Henderson)--(3178H10.35H) |
2020-05-05 | House | HA 2 to HCS, as amended, H adopted--(3178H10.07H) |
2020-05-05 | House | HA 1 to HA 2 to HCS H offered & adopted (Roden)--(3178H10.59H) |
2020-05-05 | House | HA 2 to HCS H offered (Hicks)--(3178H10.07H) |
2020-05-05 | House | HA 1 to HCS, as amended, H adopted--(3178H10.06H) |
2020-05-05 | House | HA 1 to HA 1 to HCS H offered & adopted (Merideth)--(3178H10.64H) |
2020-05-05 | House | HA 1 to HCS H offered (Schroer)--(3178H10.06H) |
2020-05-04 | House | Reported Do Pass H Fiscal Review |
2020-05-04 | House | Voted Do Pass H Fiscal Review |
2020-05-01 | House | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2020-04-30 | House | Referred H Fiscal Review Committee |
2020-04-30 | House | Reported Do Pass H Rules - Administrative Oversight |
2020-04-30 | House | Voted Do Pass H Rules - Administrative Oversight |
2020-04-29 | House | Referred H Rules - Administrative Oversight |
2020-04-29 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass H Special Committee on Regulatory Oversight and Reform |
2020-04-28 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass H Special Committee on Regulatory Oversight and Reform |
2020-04-28 | House | Hearing Conducted H Special Committee on Regulatory Oversight and Reform |
2020-03-11 | House | Referred H Special Committee on Regulatory Oversight and Reform |
2020-02-24 | House | H Second Read |
2020-02-20 | House | H First Read |
2020-02-20 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Reported from S Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Referred S Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Perfected |
2020-02-12 | Senate | SS S adopted |
2020-02-12 | Senate | SA 1 to SS S offered & Ruled out of order (Schupp)--(3178S08.06S) |
2020-02-12 | Senate | SS S offered (Luetkemeyer)--(3178S.08F) |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Reported from S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee |
2020-01-09 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee |
2020-01-08 | Senate | S First Read--SB 600-Luetkemeyer |
2019-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |