MO SB600 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-03 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-03 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Changes provisions for license plates honoring veterans; expands WWII, Korean Conflict, & Vietnam War medallion programs to Missouri National Guard members; and creates medallion programs for Operations Iraqi Freedom, New Dawn, Desert Shield & Desert Storm
Title
Changes provisions for license plates honoring veterans; expands WWII, Korean Conflict, & Vietnam War medallion programs to Missouri National Guard members; and creates medallion programs for Operations Iraqi Freedom, New Dawn, Desert Shield & Desert Storm
Sponsors
Sen. David Sater [R] | Sen. David Sater [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-03 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2014-05-30 | Senate | Delivered to Governor |
2014-05-30 | Senate | Signed by House Speaker |
2014-05-30 | Senate | Signed by Senate President Pro Tem |
2014-05-30 | Senate | Reported Duly Enrolled S Rules Committee |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed |
2014-05-01 | House | S Third Read and Passed |
2014-05-01 | House | S concurs in HCS, as amended |
2014-04-28 | House | H Third Read and Passed |
2014-04-28 | House | HCS, as amended, H adopted |
2014-04-28 | House | HA 1 to HCS H offered & adopted (English)--(4187H02.04H) |
2014-04-17 | House | Reported Do Pass H Rules Committee |
2014-04-17 | House | Voted Do Pass H Rules Committee |
2014-04-10 | House | Referred to H Rules Committee |
2014-04-10 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass H Veterans Committee |
2014-04-08 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass H Veterans Committee |
2014-04-01 | House | Hearing Conducted H Veterans Committee |
2014-03-26 | House | Referred H Veterans Committee |
2014-03-04 | House | H Second Read |
2014-03-03 | House | H First Read |
2014-02-27 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed - Consent |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Reported from S Transportation and Infrastructure Committee to Floor - Consent |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Motion to pass bill as consent taken by S Transportation and Infrastructure Committee - Consent vote adopted |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Transportation and Infrastructure Committee |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Transportation and Infrastructure Committee |
2014-01-16 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Transportation and Infrastructure Committee |
2014-01-08 | Senate | S First Read--SB 600-Sater |
2013-12-03 | Senate | Prefiled |