MO SB600 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-09 - Voted Do Pass S General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-09 - Voted Do Pass S General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the Office of Administration to provide senators and representatives with access to the dome of the State Capitol
Title
Requires the Office of Administration to provide senators and representatives with access to the dome of the State Capitol
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-09 | Voted Do Pass S General Laws Committee | |
2010-01-26 | Hearing Conducted S General Laws Committee | |
2010-01-13 | Second Read and Referred S General Laws Committee | |
2010-01-06 | S First Read--SB 600-Crowell | |
2009-12-01 | Prefiled |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/10info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=3157526 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/10info/pdf-bill/intro/SB600.pdf |